U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sandlin
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • December 15, 2022: [Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • December 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Remark]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Public Authority Opposition Witness]
  • August 18, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Bond ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 15, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • August 15, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.