U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03311
  • Case Name: McGriff El v. Centralize Infraction Bureau et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [USCA PLRA Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • December 01, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • November 16, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 26, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 26, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 19, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 15, 2022: [Complaint]
  • August 15, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.