U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03310
  • Case Name: Hemphill v. Department of Public Safety et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • May 14, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice-other]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 23, 2022: [Declaration]
  • September 23, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 14, 2022: [Declaration]
  • September 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 14, 2022: [Document]
  • September 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 12, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 12, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • September 06, 2022: [Interrogatories Propounded]
  • September 06, 2022: [Declaration]
  • September 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 06, 2022: [Request for Admissions]
  • September 06, 2022: [Document]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 15, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 15, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.