U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment in a Petty Offense Case]
  • August 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • August 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 16, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 16, 2022: [Defendant Failed to Appear, Scheduled Hearing Not Held]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.