U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02144
  • Case Name: Battle v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Reopening Case]
  • October 12, 2022: [Document]
  • October 12, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • October 12, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 06, 2022: [Document]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 19, 2022: [Case Submitted]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 16, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 16, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.