U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03312
  • Case Name: Battle v. Unnamed Defendant
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 12, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • October 12, 2022: [Complaint]
  • October 06, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • October 06, 2022: [Document]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 16, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.