U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00022
  • Case Name: IN RE MATTER OF Antonelli et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Case Number - Court of Appeals]
  • January 25, 2023: [Mandate - USCA]
  • January 25, 2023: [Order - USCA]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Appeal Filing Fee Received]
  • December 05, 2022: [Electronic Record Transmitted]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • November 02, 2022: [Declaration]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Case Number - Court of Appeals]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 12, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • September 11, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 16, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.