U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03315
  • Case Name: Kirk v. Prison Staff
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • May 01, 2025: [Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 22, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 22, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 19, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 19, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 16, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 14, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 17, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.