U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01767-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adams et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • October 20, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • October 20, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • October 20, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 11, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 18, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 18, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • August 18, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.