U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03083
  • Case Name: Frione v. Candelario et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 23, 2023: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • January 23, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other]
  • December 28, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • December 22, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
  • December 05, 2022: [Interrogatories Propounded]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 07, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • November 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 21, 2022: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 17, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.