U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01770-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moses
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • January 18, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 02, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 02, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 09, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • August 18, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.