U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vanlandingham
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 21, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • November 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 24, 2022: [Bond]
  • August 24, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 24, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 24, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • August 24, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 24, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • August 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 19, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • August 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 19, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.