U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03318
  • Case Name: Cureton v. Cherry et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 17, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 17, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • November 17, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • November 03, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • November 03, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • November 02, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • October 28, 2022: [Complaint]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 06, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 06, 2022: [Reconsideration]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 20, 2022: [Case Submitted]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Permanent Injunction]
  • August 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.