U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03317
  • Case Name: Smith v. Avent et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [USCA Order]
  • January 19, 2023: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • November 22, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • November 21, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 22, 2022: [Complaint]
  • August 22, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.