U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00388-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ventura Ventura
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 24, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 24, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 24, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2022: [Arrest]
  • August 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 22, 2022: [Complaint]
  • August 22, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.