U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-01121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hill
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 14, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 04, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 01, 2022: [Arrest ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.