U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01169-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mason
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Court Verdict ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Bench Trial - Begun ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Bench Trial - Completed ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 01, 2022: [Witness List]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 09, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 09, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 24, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.