U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02151
  • Case Name: Davis v. State of North Carolina
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 23, 2023: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • January 23, 2023: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 23, 2023: [Dismiss]
  • January 23, 2023: [Response to Habeas Petition]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 14, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2254]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
  • December 07, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Document]
  • September 26, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 20, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 20, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • September 07, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • September 07, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • September 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 24, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.