U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03319
  • Case Name: Walker v. Galbreath et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 19, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 12, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 08, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • May 05, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • May 05, 2025: [Compel]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 02, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 02, 2025: [Request for Admissions]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 21, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 21, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Entry of Default]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 04, 2024: [Motions No Longer Referred ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • October 04, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 26, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 12, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 31, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 30, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 25, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 25, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.