U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02152
  • Case Name: Eisenberg v. Warden, FCI, Butner 1
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Mail Returned]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 20, 2022: [Case Submitted]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 25, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.