U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02154
  • Case Name: King v. Ramos
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 14, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • September 14, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 26, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • August 26, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.