U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03323
  • Case Name: Judd v. Locklear
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 01, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 01, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • August 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 26, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.