U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03322
  • Case Name: Massey v. Holder et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 02, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 02, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 31, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • August 30, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 26, 2022: [Complaint]
  • August 26, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.