U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01780-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Text Order]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 29, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.