U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03325
  • Case Name: Mooney v. Locklear
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • March 31, 2025: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 20, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • October 14, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • October 14, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 13, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order (Prison Litigation Reform Act)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • October 12, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 22, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 22, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 29, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.