U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03324
  • Case Name: Hall v. Pierce
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 28, 2022: [USCA Order]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 15, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 09, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 09, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • September 09, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 29, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • August 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 29, 2022: [Complaint]
  • August 29, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.