U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02157
  • Case Name: Stokes v. Buffaloe
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 12, 2022: [Extension of Time-Other]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 29, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • August 29, 2022: [Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.