U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01783-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Beach
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Dismiss ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 18, 2023: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 21, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 30, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.