U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01787-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dix
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 20, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 30, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.