U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01804-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tarus
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Judgment ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 19, 2022: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • September 19, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 19, 2022: [Document]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 19, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 30, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.