U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01796-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Judgment ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 25, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 22, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 30, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.