U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01795-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marmolejos
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 22, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 22, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • August 30, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.