U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01794-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Letourneau
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 15, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 15, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 26, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 22, 2022: [Document]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 22, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 30, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.