U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01800-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mithlo
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 23, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 31, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.