U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01799-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mitchell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Judgment ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 23, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 23, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • August 31, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.