U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01798-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Melendez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Dismiss ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 18, 2023: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 27, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 23, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 23, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • August 31, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.