U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02159
  • Case Name: Lyons v. Bullard
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • November 09, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 18, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 01, 2022: [Letter]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 31, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.