U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03326
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Abdullah et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 08, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 08, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 07, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 31, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • August 31, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.