U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01175-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Acosta-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 15, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 06, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 02, 2022: [Text Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Complaint ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.