U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03328
  • Case Name: Rodriguez-Porras v. Fleming et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [USCA PLRA Order]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 22, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • December 22, 2022: [Subsequent Notice of Appeal]
  • December 13, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • December 12, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 12, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous]
  • November 14, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 19, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 26, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 26, 2022: [Document]
  • September 08, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 31, 2022: [Complaint]
  • August 31, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.