U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02158
  • Case Name: Pineda v. Warden, FCI Butner 1
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 05, 2023: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • January 05, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2241]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 14, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 31, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • August 31, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.