U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03329
  • Case Name: Cureton v. Gray et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Filing ]
  • September 16, 2022: [Declaration]
  • September 16, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 16, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 12, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 12, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 09, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 09, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 01, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.