U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-01131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Russell
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • November 03, 2022: [Dismiss ]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 02, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.