U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03334
  • Case Name: Jones v. Stanley et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Seal]
  • May 07, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit]
  • May 06, 2025: [Text Order]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 03, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 08, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 08, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 07, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 06, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.