U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03333
  • Case Name: Fielder v. Greenwood et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 13, 2023: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 13, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 09, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 09, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • September 06, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 06, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 06, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.