U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03335
  • Case Name: Joyner v. Hardee et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 11, 2025: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • April 10, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 10, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • April 10, 2025: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • April 10, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 10, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 09, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 09, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 09, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 06, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 06, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.