U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03339
  • Case Name: Gray v. Outlaw et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Letter]
November, 2024
  • November 01, 2024: [Status Report]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 09, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 09, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • September 09, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 07, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • September 07, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 07, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • September 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.