U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01837-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bridges
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Judgment ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Sealed Motion for revocation of pretrial release ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Waiver-Other]
  • January 06, 2023: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 22, 2022: [Document]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 22, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • September 07, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.