U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01836-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bravo
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 03, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 29, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 29, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 07, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.