U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01835-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aguayo
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 28, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 30, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • September 30, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • September 07, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.